IL SB3508 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall establish reimbursement rates that build toward livable wages for front-line personnel in residential and day programs and service coordination agencies serving persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities, including, but not limited to, intermediate care for the developmentally disabled facilities, medically complex for the developmentally disabled facilities, community-integrated living arrangements, community day services, employment, and other residential and day programs for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities supported by State funds or funding under Title XIX of the federal Social Security Act. Provides that the Department shall increase rates and reimbursements so that by July 1, 2018 direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $13.50 per hour and so that other front-line personnel earn a commensurate wage, and by July 1, 2020, direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $15 per hour and so that other front-line personnel earn a commensurate wage. Defines "front-line personnel". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FRONT-LINE PERSONNEL-BASE WAGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-009-000
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-003-000
2018-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20170555.5New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-5.4jNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback