IL SB3507 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Common School Fund Article of the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning Tax Equivalent Grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-STUDENT-PANCREATIC

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-17HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-03-14SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105518-4.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback