IL SB3504 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0948
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Collateral Recovery Act of 1934. Provides that no repossession agency employee may be issued a recovery permit if the person has been convicted of specified crimes. Makes changes concerning which crimes the Illinois Commerce Commission may require a repossession agency licensee, a recovery manager licensee, or a recovery permit holder to disclose and which crimes the Commission may use in denying or disciplining a licensee or permit holder. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COLLATERAL RECOVERY-LICENSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0948
2018-08-17SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-17SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-27SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-001
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-09HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22542245Amended CodeCitation Text
22542280Amended CodeCitation Text
22542285Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback