IL SB3503 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that on or before June 1, 2019, every facility that houses a circuit court room shall include at least one lactation room or area for members of the public to express breast milk in private that is located outside the confines of a restroom and includes, at minimum, a chair, a table, and an electrical outlet, as well as a sink with running water where possible. Provides that the lactation rooms and areas shall also meet with reasonable minimum standards prescribed by the Supreme Court of Illinois, which the Supreme Court is requested to create, including requirements for posting of notice to the public regarding location and access to lactation rooms and areas, as well as requirements for the addition of a sink with running water in the event of renovation to the facilities. Requests the Supreme Court to create minimum standards for training of courthouse staff and personnel regarding location and access to lactation rooms and areas for all people present in the courthouse who need to use lactation rooms and areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTIES CD-LACTATION ROOMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-12HouseArrived in House
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Public Health; 009-000-000
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5555-1106Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback