IL SB3500 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall protect the rights of residents to produce, consume, and store their own energy without discriminatory repercussions from a utility company. Provides that the Commission shall adopt rules that protect specified resident rights related to electricity production and storage. Provides that a resident who produces, consumes, and stores his or her own energy shall not face discriminatory rate design, treatment, or excessive compliance requirements as provided for in the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-CONSUMER PROTECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3500&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3500.htm |