IL SB3500 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CUSTODIAL SEXUAL MISCONDUCT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-11-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-11-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-11-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-11-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-11-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-11-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-11-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-11-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-11-26HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-11-20HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-03-14SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72051-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback