IL SB3497 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0843
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0843
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Local Library Act and Public Library District Act of 1991. Provides that a library board may adopt regulations waiving the nonresident fee for persons under the age of 18. Removes language in the Illinois Local Library Act providing that nothing in the Section requires a public library to participate in the non-resident card reciprocal borrowing program of a regional library system. Effective immediately.
Title
LIBRARIES-FEES/RECIPROCITY
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Ann Gillespie [D] | Sen. Mike Simmons [D] |
Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0843 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-008-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-02-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-02-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 007-001-000 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 16 | 30-55.60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
75 | 5 | 4-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |