IL SB3492 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Changes the definition of “unlawful discrimination” to include discrimination of reproductive health decisions. Defines “reproductive health decisions” as any decision by a person affecting the use or intended use of health care, goods, or services related to reproductive processes, functions, and systems. Provides that discrimination based on reproductive health decisions includes unlawful discrimination against a person because of the person's association with another person's reproductive health decisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN RIGHTS-HEALTH DISC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07SenateSession Sine Die
2024-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2024-04-11SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Fine
2024-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2024-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2024-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77551-102Amended CodeCitation Text
77551-103Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback