IL SB3491 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Network Adequacy and Transparency Act. Provides that the Act does not apply to an individual or group policy for dental or vision insurance. Provides that a network plan shall not be subject to any fines or penalties for information that the provider submits that is inaccurate or incomplete. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NETWORK ADEQUACY&TRANSPARENCY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0601
2018-06-29SenateEffective Date June 29, 2018
2018-06-29SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 011-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 011-000-000
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Insurance
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Insurance
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 29, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 010-000-000
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 015-000-000
2018-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 014-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Insurance; 014-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Insurance
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21512425Amended CodeCitation Text
2151243Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3491&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3491.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3491eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3491enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0601.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3491ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3491ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3491_04242018_024000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3491_05252018_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3491ham002_05312018_025001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3491ham001_05312018_025000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback