IL SB3489 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Registration Act. Provides that a person who is required to register under the Act may file a Petition to Review Registrant Status with the county where he or she is required to register, seeking a hearing for early removal from the Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Registry. Provides that the registrant shall be removed from the Registry if he or she can demonstrate exemplary conduct within his or her community, in addition to successful completion of the terms and conditions of his or her registration for 5 consecutive years on the Registry. Provides that exemplary conduct shall be successfully demonstrated when the registrant presents testimony, character witnesses, or other evidence to demonstrate rehabilitation and that the registrant has had no felony convictions during the last 5 years of registration. Provides that the office of the State's Attorney shall receive a copy of the petition and shall inform the victim involved of a hearing date and time and the courtroom scheduled for the hearing. Provides that specified information shall be collected and be accessible on the Statewide Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Database.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VIOLENT OFFENDER AGNST YOUTH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 007-002-000
2018-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73015412New CodeSee Bill Text
73015413New CodeSee Bill Text
73015446New CodeSee Bill Text
73015485Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback