IL SB3489 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0946
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0946
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Registration Act. Provides that a person who is required to register under the Act may file a Petition to Review Registrant Status with the county where he or she is required to register, seeking a hearing for early removal from the Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Registry. Provides that the registrant shall be removed from the Registry if he or she can demonstrate exemplary conduct within his or her community, in addition to successful completion of the terms and conditions of his or her registration for 5 consecutive years on the Registry. Provides that exemplary conduct shall be successfully demonstrated when the registrant presents testimony, character witnesses, or other evidence to demonstrate rehabilitation and that the registrant has had no felony convictions during the last 5 years of registration. Provides that the office of the State's Attorney shall receive a copy of the petition and shall inform the victim involved of a hearing date and time and the courtroom scheduled for the hearing. Provides that specified information shall be collected and be accessible on the Statewide Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Database.
Title
VIOLENT OFFENDER AGNST YOUTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0946 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 073-042-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-002-000 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 154 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 154 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 154 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 154 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |