IL SB3489 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends State Appellate Defender Act. Deletes the discretionary duty of the State Appellate Defender to provide assistance to trial counsel in capital cases. Adds the discretionary duty to provide training, assistance of expert witnesses, and investigators to public defenders from funds appropriated for those purposes. Prohibits the State Appellate Defender from being appointed as trial counsel. Deletes authority of investigators for the Capital Trial Assistance Unit and Capital Post Conviction Unit to access the Law Enforcement Agencies Data System (LEADS) for witness background checks. Deletes the authority for the State Appellate Defender to request appropriations from the Capital Litigation Trust Fund for capital case expenses in assisting trial counsel, representing petitioners in post-conviction proceedings, and in defending cases in counties other than Cook County. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM PRO - STATE APP. DEFENDER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-12-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-12-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Mu |
2012-12-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2012-12-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-12-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-12-05 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-12-05 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013 |
2012-12-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2012-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2012 |
2012-05-04 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 18, 2012 |
2012-04-10 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2012-03-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2012 |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 24, 2012 |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 105 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |