IL SB3489 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Teacher Certification Article of the School Code. Removes a provision that provides that no one may be certified to teach or supervise in the public schools who is not of good health. Provides that a person must be at least 20 (instead of 19) years of age in order to be certified to teach or supervise in the public schools. Effective July 1, 2010.
Title
SCH CD-TEACHER QUALIFICATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-23 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-03-26 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-19 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2010 | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Education | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3489&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3489.htm |