IL SB3488 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1088
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1088
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Anti-Registry Program Act. Provides that no agent or agency shall use any moneys, facilities, property, equipment, or personnel of the agency to participate in or provide support in any manner for the creation, publication, or maintenance of a registry program. Provides that no agent or agency shall provide or disclose to any government authority personal demographic information regarding any individual that is requested for the purpose of: (1) creating a registry program; or (2) requiring registration of persons in a registry program. Provides that no agent or agency shall make available personal demographic information from any agency database, including any database maintained by a private vendor under contract with the agency. Provides provisions regarding the construction and interpretation of the Act. Defines terms.
Title
ANTI-REGISTRY PROGRAM ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1088 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-018-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-05-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-23 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-17 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-000-002 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 017-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |