IL SB3488 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1088
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Anti-Registry Program Act. Provides that no agent or agency shall use any moneys, facilities, property, equipment, or personnel of the agency to participate in or provide support in any manner for the creation, publication, or maintenance of a registry program. Provides that no agent or agency shall provide or disclose to any government authority personal demographic information regarding any individual that is requested for the purpose of: (1) creating a registry program; or (2) requiring registration of persons in a registry program. Provides that no agent or agency shall make available personal demographic information from any agency database, including any database maintained by a private vendor under contract with the agency. Provides provisions regarding the construction and interpretation of the Act. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANTI-REGISTRY PROGRAM ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1088
2018-08-24SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-24SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-018-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-23HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-05-23HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-17HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-10HouseArrived in House
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-000-002
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2018-05-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-05-03SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 017-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback