IL SB3482 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision relating to purchasing service credit for certain military service, deletes the requirement of paying an additional amount representing the employer's normal cost of the benefit plus interest. Provides that this change does not entitle any person to a refund of contributions or interest already paid. Removes the change from the definition of "new benefit increase". Contains a nonacceleration provision. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-SERS-MILITARY SERVICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Executive; Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2014-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 14-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-152.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3482&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3482.htm |