IL SB3470 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that upon receiving temporary custody or guardianship of a youth in care, the Department of Children and Family Services shall assess the youth to determine whether the youth may be eligible for Social Security benefits, Supplemental Security Income, Veterans benefits, or Railroad Retirement benefits. Provides that if, after the assessment, the Department determines that the youth may be eligible for such benefits, the Department shall ensure that an application is filed on behalf of the youth. Requires the Department to prescribe by rule how it will review cases of youth in care at regular intervals to determine whether the youth may have become eligible for benefits after the initial assessment. Provides that the Department shall make reasonable efforts to encourage youth in care over the age of 18 who are likely eligible for benefits to cooperate with the application process and to assist youth with the application process. Provides that when applying for benefits, the Department shall identify a representative payee in accordance with specified federal requirements. Requires the Department to immediately notify a youth over the age of 16, the youth's attorney and guardian ad litem, and the youth's parent or legal guardian or another responsible adult of: (1) any application for or any application to become representative payee for benefits on behalf of a youth in care; (2) any communications from the Social Security Administration, the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, or the Railroad Retirement Board pertaining to the acceptance or denial of benefits or the selection of a representative payee; and (3) any appeal or other action requested by the Department regarding an application for benefits. Provides that when the Department serves as the representative payee for a youth receiving benefits, the Department shall: (i) beginning January 1, 2023, ensure that when the youth attains the age of 14 years and until the Department no longer serves as the representative payee, a minimum percentage of the youth's Supplemental Security Income benefits are conserved as specified under the amendatory Act; (2) beginning January 1, 2024, ensure that when the youth attains the age of 14 years and until the Department no longer serves as the representative payee a minimum percentage of the youth's Social Security benefits, Veterans benefits, or Railroad Retirement benefits are conserved as specified under the amendatory Act; (3) appropriately monitor any federal asset or resource limits for the benefits and ensure that the youth's best interest is served by using or conserving the benefits in a way that avoids violating any federal asset or resource limits that would affect the youth's eligibility to receive the benefits; and other matters. Contains provisions concerning annual accounting reports to a youth's attorney and guardian ad litem on how a youth's benefits have been used and conserved; financial literacy training and support for youth in care; the adoption of rules; reporting requirements for the Department; and other matters. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-YOUTH-SSI/VETS BENEFITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1014 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-03-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2022-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 35.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 505 | 5.46 | New Code | See Bill Text |