IL SB3468 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $1,000,000, or so much thereof as may be necessary, from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for grants to the Illinois Humanities Council for purposes of: (i) providing aid to humanities nonprofit organizations serving traditionally disenfranchised communities through general operating grants, training, and capacity building; and (ii) increasing statewide access to humanities-based education and free public programming for all Illinoisans in the form of college-credit-bearing courses for income eligible adults, exhibits, and public dialogue programs that foster civic engagement. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
$APPROP-HUMANITIES COUNCIL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-26 | Senate | To Appropriations- Business Regulations and Labor |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3468&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/PDF/10200SB3468.pdf |