IL SB3466 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0810
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires a school district to make reasonable efforts to provide ongoing professional development to teachers, administrators, school board members, school resource officers, and staff on the appropriate and available supportive services for the promotion of student attendance and engagement. In the Article governing compulsory attendance of pupils, provides that the term "valid cause" for absence includes when a person who has custody or control of a child withholds the child from school due to a bona fide dispute over special education services or placement that is being addressed through the child's individualized education program, federal Section 504 plan, mediation, or a due process hearing. Provides that a school district may not refer a truant, chronic truant, or truant minor to any other local public entity for the purpose of issuing the child a fine or fee as punishment for the child's absence from school; defines "local public entity." Allows a school district to refer any person having custody or control of a truant, chronic truant, or truant minor to any other local public entity for the purpose of issuing the person a fine or fee for the child's absence from school if all appropriate and available supportive services have been exhausted and the person has knowingly and willfully permitted the child's truant behavior to continue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TRUANT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0810
2018-08-10SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-10SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-27SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 077-039-000
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-29HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-003-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Education; 011-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.6Amended CodeCitation Text
105526-19New CodeSee Bill Text
105526-2aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback