IL SB3464 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a county's or municipality's initial report of its audit findings to CATV operators shall include the complete list of all addresses within the corporate limits of the county or municipality. Limits the scope of provisions concerning franchise fees and service provider fee reviews. Provides that contingent fees paid to auditors, including subcontractors, may not exceed 25% of the net amount recovered, inclusive of interest and penalties. Provides that counties and municipalities shall provide to each CATV operator an updated complete list of addresses within the corporate limits of the county or municipality annually. In addition, the county or municipality shall provide a CATV operator the updated address list within 90 days after the date of a written request by the CATV operator and before a CATV operator's franchise fees or service provider fees are derived. Holds harmless the CATV operator for any franchise fee underpayment if the county or municipality does not provide the updated address list. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTIES/MUNI-CATV FEE AUDITS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Telecommunications and Information Technology; 013-000-000
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5555-1095.1Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-42-11.05Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback