IL SB3462 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Changes the name of the Partners for Conservation Fund to the Partners for Nutrient Loss Reduction Fund and makes conforming changes throughout the Act. Provides that moneys in the Fund may be used to implement the State's Nutrient Loss Reduction Strategy, including funding for specified needs. Provides that the State Comptroller shall automatically transfer moneys to the Fund through June 30, 2026 (currently, 2021). Provides that the amount of moneys transferred from 2021 through 2026 (currently, only for 2021) shall be $35,075,000 (currently, $14,000,000). Specifies amounts and uses for moneys to be used by the Fund through specified years. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
NUTRIENT LOSS REDUCTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 17, 2020 |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As June 23, 2020 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.411 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 8.49 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 8.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |