IL SB3459 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Military Code of Illinois. Provides that when any Illinois resident dies while on State Active Duty, the Adjutant General, the Assistant Adjutant General for Army, or the Assistant Adjutant General for Air shall present one State flag of Illinois to the next of kin of the deceased who receives the United States burial flag, or that person's designee, as soon as is practicable.
Title
MILITARY–PRESENTATION OF FLAG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1083 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000 |
2022-03-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-03-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1805 | 28.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |