IL SB3452 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Extends the authorization for advance deposit wagering to December 31, 2022 (rather than December 31, 2018). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GAMING-ADVANCE DEPOSIT WAGER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 047-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 047-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-024-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-24HouseReported Back To Executive Committee;
2018-05-24HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Executive Committee; 005-000-000
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-05-09HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-07HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Gaming; 013-000-000
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Gaming
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230526Amended CodeCitation Text
230526.8Amended CodeCitation Text
230526.9Amended CodeCitation Text
230527Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3452&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3452.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3452eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3452enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3452ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3452ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3452_04262018_047000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3452_05302018_048000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3452ham002_05312018_065001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3452ham001_05312018_065000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback