IL SB3446 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Barriers Act. Creates the ADA Compliance Commission to establish best practices for a person, entity, unit of local government, or the State to comply with the federal Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990. Provides that the Commission shall have 13 members appointed to serve 3-year terms. Provides that Commission members shall serve without compensation but shall be reimbursed for travel expenses incurred in performing their duties. Requires the Commission to review any plan or design submitted by a person, entity, unit of local government, or the State for accommodations, housing, public venues, parks, transit, or any other location requiring ADA-compliant access and to provide insight, recommendations, and suggestions on ADA compliance issues. Specifies a civil penalty the Commission may impose upon persons or entities who do not comply with the ADA. Requires the Capital Development Board to provide administrative and other support to the Commission. Specifies other powers and duties of the Commission. Provides that compliance with the insight, recommendations, suggestions, or best practices guide provided by the Commission is an affirmative defense for a person or entity charged in a State court with noncompliance with the ADA. Contains other provisions. Effective January 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADA COMPLIANCE COMMISSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-18SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2022-02-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2022-02-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022
2022-02-08SenateAssigned to Executive
2022-01-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2022-01-18SenateFirst Reading
2022-01-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
410255.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback