IL SB3445 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Corporate Accountability for Tax Expenditures Act. Repeals a Section requiring the Department of Revenue to submit an annual Unified Economic Development Budget to the General Assembly. Amends the Department of Revenue Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes changes concerning electronic payments. Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that property purchased by a purchaser who is exempt from tax under federal law is exempt from the taxes under those Acts. Makes changes concerning rolling stock. Amends the State Finance Act, the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, and numerous other Acts imposing local use and occupation taxes to include a reference to tangible personal property that is subject to the 1% rate under the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act and the Service Occupation Tax Act (currently, those items are specifically named). Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that certain waivers may be granted in case of a disaster in another jurisdiction (currently, another state). Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Makes changes concerning the collection of the pari-mutuel tax. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
2018-11-14SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
2018-11-13SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-11-13SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William E. Brady
2018-11-13SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-11-13SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William E. Brady
2018-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - November 13, 2018
2018-11-07SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-11-07SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-07-08SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-06-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - June 7, 2018
2018-06-07SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000
2018-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2025052505-210Amended CodeCitation Text
20250539c-1Amended CodeCitation Text
206876-5Amended CodeCitation Text
206876-8New CodeSee Bill Text
2071510Repealed CodeCitation Text
230205Amended CodeCitation Text
230253Amended CodeCitation Text
230309Amended CodeCitation Text
230527Amended CodeCitation Text
230528.1Amended CodeCitation Text
23558-2Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-18Amended CodeCitation Text
3052013Amended CodeCitation Text
3052019New CodeSee Bill Text
3510510Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351059Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351109Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351159Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351203Amended CodeCitation Text
351205jAmended CodeCitation Text
351281-40Amended CodeCitation Text
351302Amended CodeCitation Text
351353Amended CodeCitation Text
3514310-30Amended CodeCitation Text
351456Amended CodeCitation Text
3517510Amended CodeCitation Text
354502-45Amended CodeCitation Text
354502-50Amended CodeCitation Text
355703ANew CodeSee Bill Text
355901Amended CodeCitation Text
3550513Amended CodeCitation Text
3550513a.4Amended CodeCitation Text
3550513a.5Amended CodeCitation Text
355052bAmended CodeCitation Text
355055Amended CodeCitation Text
355055aAmended CodeCitation Text
356152a.2Amended CodeCitation Text
356153Amended CodeCitation Text
356202a.2Amended CodeCitation Text
356306Amended CodeCitation Text
356402-11Amended CodeCitation Text
356402-9Amended CodeCitation Text
415125315Amended CodeCitation Text
41513565Amended CodeCitation Text
415555.10Amended CodeCitation Text
5047031Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1006Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1006.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1006.7Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1007Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1008.5Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.3-6Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1.3Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1.4Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1.6Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1.7Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-5Amended CodeCitation Text
70160530Amended CodeCitation Text
7036154.03Amended CodeCitation Text
7037204Amended CodeCitation Text
7075025Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback