IL SB3443 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Notary Public Act. Provides that the application for appointment and commission as a notary public shall include the applicant's business address if different than the applicant's residence address. Provides that an applicant's signature on a notary public application authorizes the Secretary of State to conduct a criminal background check of the applicant. Modifies provisions concerning changes causing a notary's commission to cease to be in effect. Provides that the performance of a notarial act while the commission of a notary is suspended or revoked is a prohibited act. Provides that upon the filing of any claim against a notary public or upon payment to any individual harmed as a result of a breach of duty by the notary public, the entity that has issued the bond for the notary shall notify the Secretary of whether payment was made and the circumstances which led to the claim. Adds provisions and requirements concerning reprimand, suspension, and revocation of a notary's Commission. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NOTARY-SUSPENSION & REVOCATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-16HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-05-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-09HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 012-000-000
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53122-102Amended CodeCitation Text
53124-101Amended CodeCitation Text
53126-104Amended CodeCitation Text
53127-101Amended CodeCitation Text
53127-108Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback