IL SB3436 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that energy efficiency and demand-response measures do not apply to self-directed customers. Provides that a self-directed customer is a customer of an electric utility whose total highest 30 minute demand aggregated for all of that customer's facilities within a utility service area was more than 10,000 kilowatts or whose annual aggregated usage is 500,000,000 kilowatt hours or more in this State and who complies with certain provisions. Provides that the criteria for determining qualification as a self-directing customer shall be based on the most recent 12 consecutive billing periods prior to the customer's initial application for designation as a self-directing customer. Provides that the provisions regarding self-directed customers will no longer be applicable after January 1, 2021.
Title
UTIL SELF-DIRECTED CUSTOMERS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Postponed - Energy |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 8-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3436&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3436.htm |