IL SB3432 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Makes changes to identification requirements for certain applications with the Secretary of State to serve as a dual-purpose application (to allow the applicant to register to vote or change the applicant's registered residence address or name as it appears on voter registration rolls). Provides that if an applicant provides the Secretary of State with an identification document demonstrating a lack of United States citizenship, the application shall not serve as a dual-purpose application. Provides that an agency that does not collect or cross-references reliable personal information indicating citizenship status may enter into an agreement with the State Board of Elections to transmit information that shall serve only to update an applicant's existing voter registration record. Allows the agency to transmit information on all clients who may be registered to vote with a clear indication that the information shall be used only for updates. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to, as permitted by applicable federal law, implement an automatic voter registration system for applicants for Illinois Medicaid no later than July 1, 2023. Makes other and conforming changes throughout the Code and in the Illinois Vehicle Code. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Executive- Elections |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Executive- Elections |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1A-16.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 2-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |