IL SB3430 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning tax objections based on budget or appropriation ordinances, provides that no objection to any property tax levied by any municipality or county (rather than by any municipality) shall be sustained by any court under certain conditions. Removes forest preserve districts having a population of 3,000,000 or more from the definition of "municipality" in those provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-OBJECTIONS-COUNTIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-11-29House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-11-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-11-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-000
2018-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-11-20HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-11-15HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520023-35Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback