IL SB3429 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Administration of Antibiotics to Food-Producing Animals Act. Provides that a medically important antibiotic may be administered to a food-producing animal only if prescribed by a veterinarian licensed under the Veterinary Medicine and Surgery Practice Act of 2004 who has visited the farm operation within the previous 6 months and only if deemed necessary for specified purposes. Provides that a producer may provide a medically important antibiotic to a food-producing animal only for the period necessary to accomplish the specified purposes. Provides that in that case, antibiotics should be used on the smallest number of animals and for the shortest time possible. Provides that the use of medically important antibiotics shall not exceed a duration of 21 days. Provides that a producer shall keep a record of the specific beginning and ending dates for the provision of an antibiotic. Provides that provisions concerning the administration of antibiotics to food-producing animals take effect on January 1, 2020. Requires a producer that operates a large concentrated animal feeding operation, as defined by the United States Environmental Protection Agency, to file an annual report containing specified information in a form and manner required by the Department of Public Health by rule. Provides that the Department may take the actions necessary to prepare to implement the provisions of the Act in advance of the effective date of the other provisions of the Act. Provides that the Attorney General has the exclusive authority to enforce the Act, shall issue a civil penalty of $1,000 for a violation of the Act, and may seek an injunction to prevent a violation of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-ANTIBIOTICS-ANIMALS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback