IL SB3429 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Administration Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Creates the Workforce Preparation Task Force to study and report on ways that promote the economic self-sufficiency of individuals who receive benefits under the State's General Assistance program, with the underlying intention to reduce the overall number of individuals receiving benefits under the program through increased levels of sustainable employment skills. Requires the Task Force to outline in its final report to the General Assembly and the Governor a 5-year plan that utilizes existing State resources and programs to reduce the overall number of General Assistance recipients by one-third through enrollment in and successful completion of appropriate educational or job-training programs that can directly lead to sustainable employment opportunities in the job market. Provides that the Task Force shall meet on a periodic basis to examine and compile data regarding educational and job-training programs and resources as well as levels of benefits that recipients receive from the State's General Assistance program. Requires the Department of Human Services to maintain a database of information that tracks the overall trends of the 5-year plan and to provide quarterly updates to the public in both electronic and written formats. Contains provisions concerning Task Force membership and reporting requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
WORKFRCE PREPARATON TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3429&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3429.htm |