IL SB3429 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0896
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0896
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Capital Development Board Act. Requires the Board, in consultation with the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, to initiate a study of building energy performance measures for the purposes of identifying a simple and easily understood label for a building or facility that indicates its energy use. Provides for the Board to identify no less than 10 buildings to serve as case studies. Requires the Board to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly. Effective immediately.
Title
CDB-BUILDING ENERGY LABELS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0896 | |
2010-05-24 | Effective Date May 24, 2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2010-04-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-03-23 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2010-03-22 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente | |
2010-03-19 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2010-03-19 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-18 | First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman | |
2010-03-18 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-17 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bond | |
2010-03-17 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond |