IL SB3428 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Deletes language providing that retail sales of used vehicles by an auction company at an auction that is open to the public are subject to the used vehicle implied warranty of merchantability provisions of the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CONSUMER FRAUD-AUCTION VEHICLE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2L | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3428&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3428.htm |