IL SB3425 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Merges all Article 3 police officers' pension funds and Article 4 firefighters' pension funds into the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) on January 1, 2020. Creates a Transition Board, which is responsible for planning, overseeing, and administering the consolidation. Authorizes the Transition Board to undertake numerous activities necessary for the consolidation, including making arrangements for the transfer of assets and liabilities and for making recommendations to IMRF for an appropriate system of determining, administering, receiving, and enforcing the required municipal contributions to the Fund. Makes conforming and other changes. Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law (PTELL) of the Property Tax Code to exclude from the definition of "aggregate extension" special purpose extensions made for contributions to IMRF for benefits under the Downstate Police and Downstate Firefighter Articles. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately, except that certain changes to the Illinois Pension Code and PTELL of the Property Tax Code take effect January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-DNST POL-FIRE-IMRF MERGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenateTo Subcommittee on Pension Consolidation
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.42New CodeSee Bill Text
3520018-185Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-101Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-101.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-101.2New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-102.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-103Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-103.9New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-105Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-108.2Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-108.3Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-110Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-110.7Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-125Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-125.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-128Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-134Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-135Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-141Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-141aNew CodeSee Bill Text
4053-141bNew CodeSee Bill Text
4054-101Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-101.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-101.2New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-102.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-103Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-105Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-105cAmended CodeCitation Text
4054-105dAmended CodeCitation Text
4054-106.5New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-108Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-118Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-118.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-121Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-124Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-128Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-130.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-130.3New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-134Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-175Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-175.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-199.5New CodeSee Bill Text
4057-199.6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback