IL SB3424 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Provides that "hospital worker" means any person who receives an hourly wage directly or indirectly via a subcontractor by a hospital licensed under the Act. Replaces references to "nurse" with "hospital worker". Provides for additional staffing transparency and reporting requirements. Provides that hospitals licensed under the Act must employ and schedule enough hospital workers to provide quality patient care and ensure patient safety. Provides that hospitals must make available, at the beginning of each calendar year and upon request, all staffing matrices and other staffing metrics, if any, used to assess and maintain safe staffing levels for hospital workers in each unit. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall produce an annual report based on staffing disclosures. Provides that the Department shall make recommendations for minimum staffing standards for hospital workers in each hospital unit. Provides that hospitals licensed under the Act shall conduct, within the first month of employment and at no cost, a competency validation for each hospital worker hired. Provides that a hospital must submit documentation of each hospital worker's competency validation to the Department within 4 weeks after the worker's start date. Provides that hospitals shall conduct ongoing verification for each hospital worker employed during a given calendar year to determine each worker's continued competency to perform the worker's job and shall submit documentation of each worker's ongoing verification to the Department within 2 weeks of completion. Provides that hospitals shall submit a list of all competent employees currently employed at the end of each calendar year. Provides for a public registry of all competent employees to be maintained by the Department. Provides for the imposition of civil penalties for specified violations of the Act. Describes an assignment despite objection resolution process to be implemented by each hospital that is licensed under the Act. Provides for a Hospital Safety Advocate role to be created within the Department.
Title
HOSPITAL STAFFING LEVELS
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Javier Cervantes [D] | Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 85 | 10.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 85 | 10.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 85 | 10.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3424&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3424.htm |