IL SB3419 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that any municipality and any county board, for the unincorporated area of the county, shall have the power by ordinance to determine the number of licenses to be issued to licensed establishments, licensed fraternal establishments, licensed veterans establishments, and licensed truck stop establishments located within the municipality or unincorporated area of the county; however, the number of licenses issued shall not be lower than the number of liquor licenses and the number of licensed truck stop establishments allowed in the municipality or unincorporated area of the county on the date that an ordinance limiting the number of licensed establishments, licensed fraternal establishments, licensed veterans establishments, and licensed truck stop establishments is enacted. Further provides that the municipality or county board shall inform the Board of such an ordinance within 30 days after its enactment. Effective January 1, 2015.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-LICENSE LIMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |