IL SB3418 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provide that a school board may, by resolution, enter into a joint agreement with other school boards to share the services of a superintendent or other administrators. Provides that the question of whether a school board shall enter into a joint agreement with other school boards for shared services of a superintendent or other administrators shall be submitted to the voters of each affected school district at the next consolidated election only upon submission of a petition signed by no less than 10% of the registered voters in each affected school district. Provides that a school district wishing to withdraw from a joint agreement may obtain from its school board a written resolution approving the withdrawal and shall present the petition for withdrawal to the other member school districts within the timelines designated by the joint agreement. Specifies procedures if a school district's petition for withdrawal is not approved and the school district is part of a Class II county school unit outside of a city with 500,000 or more inhabitants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SUPERINTENDENT AGREEMNT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-002-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-17SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 009-003-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-12SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-21.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback