IL SB3417 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Education Empowerment Act, the purpose of which is to grant school districts greater autonomy to implement practices that improve student academic performance and benefit the whole child by removing obstacles that currently exist in law or rules. Provides that school districts seeking to establish an empowerment area and be designated as such by the State Superintendent of Education must create an empowerment committee to develop a plan; sets forth provisions concerning the committee and plan. Contains provisions concerning statutory and regulatory mandates; plan submission and designation; financial support for planning; empowerment area review, renewal, and revocation; reporting; and rulemaking. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION EMPOWERMENT AREA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-03-14SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED)
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.25gAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback