IL SB3416 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the One Day Rest In Seven Act. Provides that specified provisions of the Act do not apply to employees for whom work hours, days of work, and rest periods are established through the collective bargaining process.
Title
ONE DAY REST IN 7-APPLICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1012 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2022-04-06 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-001 |
2022-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-04-05 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-011-000 |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-002-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 018-000-000 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 219 | 100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |