IL SB3415 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Deletes language providing that the Section concerning the traffic and pedestrian stop statistical study is repealed on July 1, 2019. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall report specified findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on March 1, 2022 (rather than March 1, 2004).
Title
TRAFFIC/PEDESTRIAN STOP STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed November 14, 2018 |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 1, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 006-002-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |