IL SB3411 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Stalking No Contact Order Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STALKING NO CONTACT ORDER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
740211Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback