IL SB3411 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1000
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1000
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Stalking No Contact Order Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STALKING NO CONTACT ORDER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1000 |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-001 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 21 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |