IL SB3411 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-15)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-15)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a county or municipality may not require a law enforcement officer to issue a specific number of citations or warnings within a designated period of time. Provides that a county or municipality may not, for purposes of evaluating a law enforcement officer's job performance, compare the number of citations or warnings issued by the law enforcement officer to the number of citations or warnings issued by any other law enforcement officer who has similar job duties. Limits home rule powers. Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that it shall be an unfair labor practice to require a peace officer to perform a duty that conflicts with the provisions of this amendatory Act.
Title
CNTY/MUNI-NO TICKET QUOTAS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0650 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2014-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2014-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-009-001 |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-003-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2014-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2014-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2014-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2014-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2014-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2014-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2014-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2014-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2014-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-16 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-11 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2014-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-04-11 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Manar |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Labor and Commerce; 010-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor and Commerce |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor and Commerce; 016-000-000 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor and Commerce |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Labor and Commerce |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1136 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-1-12 | New Code | See Bill Text |