IL SB3408 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, and provides that the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum Act, to the extent that there is a conflict between the provisions of Executive Order 2017-1 and the Act, supersedes the Executive Order, and shall be controlling.
Title
LINCOLN PRESIDENTIAL LIBRARY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 008-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3425 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3475 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3475 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3475 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |