IL SB3404 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEXUAL VIOLENCE-HIGHER EDUC

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Raoul
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Raoul
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255100-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback