IL SB3403 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the applicability of the common law.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 1-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |