IL SB3402 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Council on Women and Girls Act. Creates the Illinois Council on Women and Girls. Provides that the Council shall advise the Governor and the General Assembly on policy issues impacting women and girls in this State with specified goals. Provides for the appointment of members to the Council. Provides for the meetings and operations of the Council. Requires the Council to issue semi-annual reports on its policy recommendations by June 30th and December 31st of each year to the Governor and the General Assembly. Provides findings and declaration of policy. Provides a severability clause. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IL COUNCIL ON WOMEN & GIRLS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-001-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback