IL SB3397 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Illinois Athletic Trainers Practice Act. Makes conforming changes in the Regulatory Sunset Act, the School Code, the Interscholastic Athletic Organization Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ATHLETIC TRAINERS-REPEAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105251.20Amended CodeCitation Text
105522-80Amended CodeCitation Text
2255ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
5804.36Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback