IL SB3395 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Occupational Therapy Practice Act and the Illinois Physical Therapy Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may issue an occupational therapist, occupational therapy assistant, physical therapist, or physical therapist assistant license to an applicant who is licensed under another jurisdiction upon filing an application, paying the required fee, and meeting requirements established by rule (rather than if the requirements for licensure in that jurisdiction were, at the date of licensure, substantially equivalent to the requirements in force in this State on that date or equivalent to the requirements of this Act). Provides that an applicant for endorsement shall meet the requirements for endorsement upon filing the application, paying the required fee, and showing proof of licensure in another jurisdiction for at least 10 consecutive years without discipline by certified verification of licensure by the jurisdiction. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHYSICAL THERAPY-ENDORSEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2257513Amended CodeCitation Text
2259011Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback