IL SB3395 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0893
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0893
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Occupational Therapy Practice Act and the Illinois Physical Therapy Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may issue an occupational therapist, occupational therapy assistant, physical therapist, or physical therapist assistant license to an applicant who is licensed under another jurisdiction upon filing an application, paying the required fee, and meeting requirements established by rule (rather than if the requirements for licensure in that jurisdiction were, at the date of licensure, substantially equivalent to the requirements in force in this State on that date or equivalent to the requirements of this Act). Provides that an applicant for endorsement shall meet the requirements for endorsement upon filing the application, paying the required fee, and showing proof of licensure in another jurisdiction for at least 10 consecutive years without discipline by certified verification of licensure by the jurisdiction. Effective immediately.
Title
PHYSICAL THERAPY-ENDORSEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0893 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date August 14, 2018 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 75 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 90 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |